BURTON GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the training, education and professional development of clinical staff at Burton Hospitals and within the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 September 1978: Standard registration
- 03 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1055519 BURTON HOSPITALS NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND
- THE COUNCIL OF BURTON GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.89k | £14.63k | £6.23k | £3.65k | £1.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.90k | £25.35k | £13.95k | £2.17k | £4.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 21 July 2015 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 18 July 2014 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 10 March 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 23 October 2013 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 22 July 2013 | 22 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 DECEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 1978, 21 JANUARY 1982, 20 JANUARY 1983 AND 27 JANUARY 1992, 31ST OCTOBER 1994.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN POST-GRADUATE MEDICAL SCHOOLS AT BURTON ON TRENT FOR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF GRADUATES IN MEDICINE DENTISTRY AND RELATED ARTS AND SCIENCES. (II) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF SCIENCE AND MEDICINE, AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF MEDICINE AND SURGERY. (III) TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FACILITIES FOR MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window