Accounts and annual returns FOOTSTEPS DAYHAB

Charity number: 1169932
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 01 July 2019 08 September 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2019 08 September 2020 130 days late
Annual return 01 July 2018 08 September 2020 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2018 08 September 2020 496 days late
Annual return 01 July 2017 15 May 2018 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 May 2018 14 days late