Mosaic LGBT+ Young Persons' Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mosaic LGBT Youth Centre supports, educates and inspires young LGBT+ persons through the provision of: - youth club - LGBT youth summer camp and winter retreat - mentoring - events - arts and heritage programmes Mosaic LGBT Youth Centre also supports, educates and inspires wider society through: - professionals training - awareness workshops in schools - provision of consultancy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 April 2016: CIO registration
- MOSAIC LGBT YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Mosaic LGBT+ Young Persons' Trust (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Charles Batty | Chair | 13 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Gemma Benton | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Howe | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Lewis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Cochrane | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashwin Bungarnayak | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Christopher Alderwick | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Joy Singlehurst | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Maria Wittams | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin McGlynn-Moore | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madison Pollard-Shore | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christos Papaioannou | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norman James Powell | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.63k | £141.37k | £154.52k | £183.67k | £268.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.75k | £111.00k | £137.32k | £150.26k | £247.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.95k | £14.00k | £94.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.16k | £31.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Apr 2016 as amended on 15 Apr 2020 as amended on 08 Oct 2020 as amended on 19 Oct 2020 as amended on 05 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
* TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS SUFFERED BY YOUNG PERSONS WITHIN GREATER LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO ARE LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECTS OF INCREASING SELF-ESTEEM AND POSITIVE IDENTITY AMONGST SAID PERSONS. * TO PROMOTE EQUALITY, DIVERSITY AND COMMUNITY COHESION AS WELL AS TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PERSONS BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES AFFECTING SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
201 Drummond Street
London
NW1 3FE
- Phone:
- 07550124393
- Email:
- info@mosaictrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window