SUCKLEY PARISH, ACADEMY AND COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPACE is a church, school and community initiative to use the large church building as a multi-purpose hub for this scattered rural village. The school too needs a large space. Effective heating, disabled access, kitchen and toilet, separate meeting room for Citizens Advice Bureau and Wifi hub all offer community opportunities to help address rural isolation for all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 October 2016: Standard registration
- SPACE (Working name)
- SUCKLEY PARISH ACADEMY AND COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Wilkins | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Owen | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anne Potter | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|||||
DIANA WENDY LOUISE HOLLOWAY BA, ACA | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATON GOFF BDS | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE MARGARET LEWIS | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|||||
PROF RICHARD ALEXANDER LEWIS DM FRCP | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
LADY SUSANNA MCFARLANE MCSP DL | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.54k | £11.15k | £19.16k | £11.25k | £21.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.40k | £271 | £6.58k | £2.27k | £47.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £428 | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2016 as amended on 05 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE CARE, MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC, ORNAMENTS AND FURNISHINGS OF SUCKLEY PARISH CHURCH, IN SUCKLEY WORCESTERSHIRE. 2. TO PROMOTE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE LOCAL INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CREWS COURT
SUCKLEY
WORCESTER
WR6 5DW
- Phone:
- 01886884552
- Email:
- annelewis@doctors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window