Financial history HANSEATIC UNION

Charity number: 1168076
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £38.40k £35.35k £65.88k £65.88k £211.50k
Total expenditure £35.45k £35.39k £48.37k £50.08k £122.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £30.00k £30.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.58k £5.83k