FRIENDS OF ST. JAMES WESTHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support for the maintenance of St. James Church Westhead and churchyard and provides support for recreational and educational activities in the Westhead area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES NORMAN HOOKER | Chair | 16 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Herbert Wright | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99k | £914 | £310 | £303 | £711 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £1.11k | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO ARE: A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY HELPING TOWARD THE COSTS OF: I. THE PRESERVATION OF THE FABRIC, ORNAMENTS AND FURNITURE OF THE CHURCH BUILDING INCLUDING INSURANCE, REPAIRS AND DEVELOPMENT. II. THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHURCHYARD. B. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF WESTHEAD, LANCASHIRE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Moss Cottages
Plough Lane
Lathom
ORMSKIRK
Lancashire
L40 6JL
- Phone:
- 07785325167
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window