Trustees THE HOLME READING ROOM TRUST
Charity Number: 1167804

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Margaret Ebeling | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marie Roderick-Smith | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Edwards | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward David Alexander Whittaker | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLAUDE SARGENT | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MARGARET AYLESBURY | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRIFFIN | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL NEAL | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|||||
HOWARD BOLTON WATSON | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.