MERYC-ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MERYC-ENGLAND aims to raise standards of practice in early childhood music education. The charity works towards its aims by fostering collaboration between researchers and practitioners in conferences and high quality professional programmes. We support research which will raise standards of practice. We speak up on behalf of the sector in national fora and respond to national policy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 October 2016: CIO registration
- MERYC-UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Julia Partington | Chair | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ryan David Humphrey | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Shyan Ballantine-Drake | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Bowden | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Cavanagh | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Grocott | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margareta Burrell | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JESSICA JANE PITT | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHRISTINE PASCAL OBE | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £531 | £412 | £3.65k | £1.15k | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.79k | £786 | £1.94k | £771 | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 06 OCT 2016 AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF MERYC ENGLAND ARE TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED 0 TO 5 YEARS IN ENGLAND BY: I. PROMOTING THE INTEGRATION OF RESEARCH, THEORY AND PRACTICE BY ORGANISING AND FUNDING MEETINGS FOR THAT PURPOSE; II. SUPPORTING RESEARCH INITIATIVES THAT SERVE TO INCREASE THE QUANTITY AND QUALITY OF EARLY CHILDHOOD MUSICAL EXPERIENCES; III. ENCOURAGING EVIDENCE-BASED PRACTICE, CRITICAL REFLECTION AND THE ADOPTION OF PRINCIPLES OF SOCIAL JUSTICE; IV. REVIEWING POLICES THAT AFFECT EARLY CHILDHOOD MUSICAL EXPERIENCES AND EDUCATION; V. PROMOTING EARLY CHILDHOOD MUSIC EDUCATION (ECME) IN NATIONAL, EUROPEAN AND INTERNATIONAL MEETINGS; VI. CONNECTING WITH ORGANISATIONS AND SCHEMES WHOSE AIMS AND ACTIVITIES CONCORD WITH MERYC PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CREC St. Thomas Childrens Centre
Bell Barn Road
BIRMINGHAM
B15 2AF
- Phone:
- 0121 4640020
- Email:
- chair@meryc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window