COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION (THIRSK, SOWERBY AND DISTRICT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thirsk Community Care works in the community to support and enrich the lives of those in need. We deliver our services by working in partnership with volunteers to run a community car scheme, a befriending service, a sitting service for carers, services for children/young people with special needs, a womens project and other services to combat loneliness and isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £88,954 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 September 1978: Standard registration
- 04 March 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- THIRSK C C A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.40k | £293.58k | £395.64k | £298.73k | £331.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.40k | £295.98k | £418.80k | £310.69k | £365.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £109.18k | £92.12k | £85.59k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.82k | £100.63k | £22.75k | £88.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 21 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 18 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 08 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 18 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1978 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THIRSK, SOWERBY AND DISTRICT AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
THIRSK, SOWERBY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window