THE PURPLE PENGUIN CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Purple Penguin Club is a small local charity in Dagenham, which provides high quality fun and social clubs and activities for children aged 5-18 years who have a disability or additional need (those children who are unable to attend other mainstream groups/clubs or sporting activities because of their high level of needs).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £96,500 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARRON BECKWITH | Chair | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Jamie Cameron Allen | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Lianne Lusted | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Flint | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Heary | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM SHUFFLE | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASMINE ZOE LOUISE Collins | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.73k | £88.98k | £105.67k | £160.43k | £203.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.43k | £79.46k | £94.28k | £150.00k | £193.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £30.40k | £22.41k | £63.61k | £96.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE A DISABILITY (AGED BETWEEN 5 AND 18 YEARS) AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING A QUALITY RESPITE SOCIAL CLUB WITHIN HAVERING AND ITS NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS FOR THEIR BENEFIT. BY “DISABILITY” WE MEAN A PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR MENTAL IMPAIRMENT (INCLUDING MENTAL HEALTH) WHICH IN INTERACTION WITH SOCIAL, ATTITUDE AND ENVIRONMENTAL CONSTRAINTS CREATES BARRIERS WHICH HINDER A PERSON’S FULL AND EQUAL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
F.A.O The Purple Penguin Club
The Vibe
195-211 Becontree Avenue
Dagenham
RM8 2UT
- Phone:
- 07713983995
- Email:
- fun@purplepenguinclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window