MAYFIELD AND FIVE ASHES COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community based services and support for those living in the Parish of Mayfield and Five Ashes and its surrounding area within East Sussex, to assist in combatting loneliness and isolation and to promote general heath improvement and sustain quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £55,182 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 20 April 2016: CIO registration
- 14 January 2025: Funds received from 1181688 WADHURST PARK FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME LUCY FIRRELL DBE QC | Chair | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Brian Ronald Cook | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Miles Smith | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Catherine Jane Kerr | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||
TESSA GREGORY | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
CAROLINE KEMP | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
CHARLES HOWE MARSHALL | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD PENTICOST | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.28k | £69.77k | £48.04k | £102.37k | £94.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.60k | £55.98k | £72.28k | £57.79k | £91.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.46k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £17.50k | £5.00k | £6.26k | £55.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 20 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY BASED SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE LIVING IN THE PARISH OF MAYFIELD AND FIVE ASHES AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN EAST SUSSEX, TO ASSIST IN COMBATTING LONELINESS AND ISOLATION AND TO PROMOTE GENERAL HEALTH IMPROVEMENT AND SUSTAIN QUALITY OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
London House
High Street
MAYFIELD
East Sussex
TN20 6AQ
- Phone:
- 01435873888
- Email:
- manager@mayfacs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window