SPEAR ISLINGTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide coaching and development to young people from disadvantaged backgrounds to help them find employment and build their confidence and sense of self worth. We run the Spear Programme for up to 90 young people aged 16-24 each year. The programme comprises 6 weeks of training followed by a year of support. 75% of our young people are in work or further training 12 months after the course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 28 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aisling Teo | Chair | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWIN D'SOUZA | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Reichmann | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joey Chung Yin Lai | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aisling Marie Cronin | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Alana Graham | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan William Horsford | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.08k | £124.85k | £135.55k | £125.85k | £178.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.68k | £87.07k | £88.67k | £96.22k | £109.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £24.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 TO 24 LIVING IN AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT. ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE ADVANCE IN LIFE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO AND PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT, ENABLING YOUNG PEOPLE TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary Magdalene Church
Holloway Road
LONDON
N7 8LT
- Phone:
- 07375 485344
- Email:
- hello@spearislington.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window