CANCER REDUCTION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Cameroon
Governance
- 26 August 2016: CIO registration
- CRF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR FRANCIS OBALE BSC, MSC AND PHD IN SOIL SCIENCE | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAM TAYLOR-SMITH MEDICAL STUDENT MANCHESTER UNIV | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISAAC HAQ MEDICAL STUDENT CAMBRIDGE UNIV | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN CUMBRIA AND LANCASHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO RAISE AWARENESS OF CANCER AND OF APPROPRIATE SELF-EXAMINATION PROCEDURES AND RECOGNITION OF EARLY SYMPTOMS OF CANCER TO ASSIST IN THE EARLY DETECTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCER.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Flintergill Close
Dent
SEDBERGH
LA10 5RP
- Phone:
- 07958642302
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window