Trustees Wereham Village Hall CIO
Charity number: 1168472

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Albert Murray | Chair | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANE WOOLSTON | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA GODDON | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Hooper | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Goddon | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jayne Philippa Mackay | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANN PEASE | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ROY PEASE | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Ivy Rolph | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.