THE INVESTINDUSTRIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROMOTION OF: (1) EDUCATION; (2) ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND/OR CONSERVATION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT; AND (3) THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OR SCIENCE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Italy
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 14 September 2016: Standard registration
- THE BI-INVEST FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emanuele Bonomi | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROHAN MAXWELL | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Ramsden | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER DUNN | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17m | £744.36k | £9.88m | £864.15k | £258.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13m | £752.16k | £714.32k | £384.87k | £1.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.17m | £744.36k | £9.88m | £864.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £744.36k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.13m | £752.16k | £714.32k | £384.87k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.82k | £11.73k | £10.80k | £15.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.13m | £740.44k | £703.52k | £369.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROMOTION OF: (1) EDUCATION; (2) ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND/OR CONSERVATION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT; AND (3) THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OR SCIENCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
One Hoopers Court
London
SW3 1AF
- Phone:
- 02076642121
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window