CLAWS RESCUE HULL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports animals in the Hull area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2021
Total income includes £12,098 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- NOT JUST PETS RESCUE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2017 | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.53k | £23.24k | £35.50k | £30.25k | £59.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £21.60k | £32.22k | £24.67k | £59.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 145 days late | |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 23 November 2022 | 510 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 23 November 2022 | 510 days late | |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 245 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2017 as amended on 16 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND OTHER DOMESTIC ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN CATTERIES, REFUGES, RESCUE HOMES, SANCTUARIES OR ANY OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK, ABANDONED OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window