HECTOR'S GREYHOUND RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hectors Greyhound Rescue activities are to rescue and rehome sighthounds and to promote responsible dog ownership
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,377 from 28377 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAYLEY JANINE DONATA BRADLEY | Chair | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||
Martin Simmons | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|||
Alison Jones | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|||
Fred Brown | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.69k | £138.81k | £131.65k | £131.15k | £168.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.52k | £127.62k | £124.93k | £143.15k | £161.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS RESCUE DOGS, IN PARTICULAR EX-RACING GREYHOUNDS AND/OR SIGHTHOUNDS THAT ARE NO LONGER WANTED BY THEIR OWNERS AND/OR WHO HAVE BEEN ABANDONED, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR SUCH DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG SUCH DOGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Hammonds Place
Gobowen
OSWESTRY
SY11 3PA
- Phone:
- 01691657212
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window