FRITTON OWL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give a forever home to unwanted and captive bred Owls. Injured native wild Owls which are rescued are assessed and treated in consultation with our local vet. When they are healthy and rehabilitated they are released back into the wild. We give educational talks to school, colleges and groups about the plight of wild Owls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Ann Ireland | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Ireland | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Brunger | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elle Sturman | Trustee | 31 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Patricia Varney | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN BUSS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.54k | £12.38k | £27.26k | £31.99k | £73.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.14k | £12.18k | £16.73k | £29.02k | £47.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF NEGLECTED UNWANTED AND CAPTIVE BRED OWLS. THIS IS DONE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE APPROPRIATE TREATMENT AND CARE THAT THEY REQUIRE. WE ALSO OFFER THEN THE PROTECTION AND SECURITY FROM ILLNESSES, MALTREATMENT AND ILL-INFORMED OWNERS. INJURED NATIVE WILD OWLS ARE ASSESSED AND TREATED IN CONSULTATION WITH OUR LOCAL VET. WHEN THEY ARE HEALTHY AND REHABILITATED THEY ARE RELEASED BACK INTO THE WILD. WE EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG OWLS AND OTHER NATIVE SPECIES, BY SCHOOL VISITS, FETES, AND TALKS TO LOCAL GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fritton Plant Centre
Beccles Road
Fritton
GREAT YARMOUTH
Norfolk
NR31 9EX
- Phone:
- 07983401861
- Website:
-
No web site at present
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window