Financial history BROMLEY TEMPLE TRUST

Charity number: 1166773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/10/2019 25/10/2020 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.71k £11.96k £23.02k £39.73k £37.60k
Total expenditure £19.88k £6.86k £12.15k £23.43k £25.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A