Trustees APPLETON ROEBUCK PRE-SCHOOL GROUPS
Charity number: 1166924

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgia Wainwright | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gemma OConnor | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Ryley | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Campbell-Wilcock | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
AMY LOUISE WOODCOCK | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Boyeson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Rothwell | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.