APPLETON THORN VILLAGE HALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a village hall and so provides a venue for a variety of activities for a complete age spectrum-educational and social/recreational.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 05 June 1979: Standard registration
- APPLETON THORN VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dewi Williams | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Clive Peterken | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Plass | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
IRENE BAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAN HEAPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN RUTH PLASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.80k | £42.30k | £41.55k | £45.45k | £54.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.55k | £19.47k | £28.28k | £39.83k | £51.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £20.15k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 4 APRIL 1978 AS AMENDED 21 JANUARY 1998 AND 18 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL TO BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF APPLETON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF APPLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 PARKLAND CLOSE
APPLETON THORN
WARRINGTON
WA4 4RH
- Phone:
- 01925264843
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window