Financial history MOSTON MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1168322
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.86k £41.77k £35.11k £27.06k £25.49k
Total expenditure £24.00k £21.70k £22.49k £13.19k £13.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.21k N/A N/A N/A