Financial history IMAAN FOUNDATION (WEST MIDLANDS)

Charity number: 1167676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.73k £5.71k £5.51k £8.65k £4.78k
Total expenditure £5.07k £8.09k £5.60k £5.82k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A