STATIONERS' HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and learning, including education in relation to the hall, library and archive of the Stationers' Company primarily via public access. The preservation, maintenance and enhancement of Stationers' Hall, and its immediate environs, and the preservation and conservation of artefacts and items of historic or artistic interest or merit of the library and archive of the Stationers' Company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin William Leonard Randall | Chair | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Carol Anne Tullo | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Stephen Robert Richard Bourne | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
LUCY FIONA HEATH DENTON | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
GEOFFREY MICHAEL BOYD PICK BA DAA | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE LUKE JONATHAN MILLER MA | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
MARTIN WILLIAM ASHLEY MVO | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £488.52k | £400.71k | £81.00k | £172.78k | £122.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £752.81k | £126.65k | £1.01m | £314.84k | £14.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2016 as amended on 20 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THE HALL, LIBRARY AND ARCHIVE OF THE STATIONERS' COMPANY, PRIMARILY BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC ACCESS; AND 2) THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF STATIONERS' HALL, AVE MARIA LANE, LONDON EC4M 7DD AND ITS IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS, AND THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF ARTEFACTS AND ITEMS OF HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST OR MERIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE LIBRARY AND ARCHIVE OF THE STATIONERS' COMPANY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STATIONERS HALL
STATIONERS HALL COURT
AVE MARIA LANE
LONDON
EC4M 7DD
- Phone:
- 02072460990
- Email:
- hallcharity@stationers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window