THE DYSLEXIA TEACHING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assessment and specialist teaching for adults and children. Maintaining a teaching and resource centre. Supporting dyslexic pupils in local schools.Raising funds to pay for the support of those pupils, and for dyslexic children who have the need, but whose parents do not have the means, to receive tuition at the centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 16 May 2016: CIO registration
- 20 July 2018: Funds received from 290244 DYSLEXIA TEACHING CENTRE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA RUTH MANN | Chair | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suzanna Marie Clarissa Hardman | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gerald William Libby | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Amrolia | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donal Gerard Quinn | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.74k | £72.40k | £67.91k | £53.88k | £36.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299.94k | £41.43k | £37.03k | £31.97k | £35.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 May 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DYSLEXIA, DYSPRAXIA, DYSCALCULIA, DYSGRAPHIA, ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDER AND OTHER SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND DISABILITIES AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, PARTICULARLY BY: (1) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE APPROPRIATE TEACHING AND SUPPORT; (2) PROVIDING OUTREACH PROGRAMMES TO SCHOOLS AND OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS TO WIDEN ACCESS TO SUCH TEACHING AND SUPPORT; AND (3) PROVIDING SUPPORT (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO FINANCIAL, LOGISTICAL AND TRAINING SUPPORT) TO SCHOOLS AND OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PROVIDE SUCH OUTREACH PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 KENSINGTON SQUARE
LONDON
W8 5HN
- Phone:
- 02073614790
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window