FRIENDS OF BOLNORE VILLAGE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a PTA raising money for extra curricular activities to support the school curriculum and benefit the children of Bolnore Village Primary School. We do this by running fundraising events such as Quiz Nights, School Discos, Film Nights and Sponsored Activities. These events are usually held on school premises with the assistance of the school community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 June 2016: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF BOLNORE VILLAGE PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Watkins-Nobbs | Chair | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Birch | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Cates | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Bascombe | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katarzyna Nosal | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Harper | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trymore Tokoma | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayla Turgutlu | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Alexandra Kingsland Porter | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Eve Falkner | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shilpa Arora | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Samantha Hawksdale Larby | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.47k | £7.17k | £6.19k | £18.79k | £16.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.19k | £1.48k | £201 | £12.11k | £17.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 SUPPORTING THE SCHOOL TO DEVELOP EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ENRICH THE LEARNING ENVIRONMENT OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOLNORE VILLAGE PRIMARY SCHOOL
UPDOWN HILL
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 4GD
- Phone:
- 01444456715
- Email:
- friendsofbvps@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window