ZANTE STRAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting and fundraising the rescue and responsible treatment of unwanted and stray animals in Zakynthos island in Greece, then aiding the rehoming of these animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greece
Governance
- 26 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beryl Marshall | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BANNISTER | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dimitra Kontonis | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Astrid Kooring | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.73k | £174.79k | £166.83k | £156.44k | £164.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.51k | £159.66k | £159.48k | £172.18k | £167.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR ON THE ISLAND OF ZANTE, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Swallow Close
FELIXSTOWE
Suffolk
IP11 9LR
- Phone:
- 01394283597
- Email:
- Info.zantestrays@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window