JANAKALYAN TRUST HABIBPUR, UK

Charity number: 1167295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HABIBPUR IN JAGONNATHPUR, SUNAMGANJ, BANGLADESH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND NECESSARY SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bangladesh

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMMED ALI AHMED Chair 08 September 2015
None on record
MD MISKAT UDDIN Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
MOHAMMED AKIKUR RAHMAN Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
SHAH MONIR AHMED Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
MOHAMMED ZUBAIR AHMED Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
TASKIR ALI Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
ABU TAREQ Trustee 08 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.91k £10.73k £1.42k £3.48k £0
Total expenditure £10.21k £6.22k £0 £210 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 GRANGE STREET
OLDHAM
OL9 6DX
Phone:
01616650116
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available