SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Club meets 1st Fri. of month.(except: Jan. Aug.& Dec.) from:- 2 to 4pm at Bicton Heath Community Centre, Pensfold, Gains Park Way, Shrewsbury,SY3 5HF. Entertainment through the year includes:- slide shows, talks,musical entertainers, choirs, etc followed by tea/coffee & eats. Every meeting ends with a fund raising raffle. We hire a wheelchair friendly coach with a side lift for our monthly trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 02 June 1987: Standard registration
- 15 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 August 2024: Funds transferred to 211015 STROKE ASSOCIATION
- THE STROKE CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.81k | £4.53k | £4.40k | £56 | £315 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.91k | £8.03k | £6.21k | £174 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 1978
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE COMFORT AND SUPPORT PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED DISABLEMENT FROM A STROKE. (B) TO PROVIDE OR SECURE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT AND WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS. (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CENTRAL SHROPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window