HULL AND DISTRICT TALKING MAGAZINE FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supply fortnightly recordings of local news and local features to the blind & partially sighted of Hull and the East Riding of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 28 September 1978: Standard registration
- HULL AND DISTRICT TALKING MAGAZINE (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA LOVE | Chair | 21 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Tracey Barker | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN STONE | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADAM KEECH | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ MEECH | Trustee | 10 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CONNOLLY | Trustee | 12 May 2002 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SPOKES | Trustee | 12 May 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £3.65k | £1.71k | £2.82k | £1.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.56k | £3.31k | £3.61k | £3.84k | £4.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF AUDIO RECORDINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hull & District Talking Magazine
25 Portland Street
HULL
HU2 8JX
- Phone:
- 01482585822
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window