Trustees HULL AND DISTRICT TALKING MAGAZINE FOR THE BLIND
Charity number: 507992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA LOVE | Chair | 21 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Tracey Barker | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN STONE | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADAM KEECH | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ MEECH | Trustee | 10 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CONNOLLY | Trustee | 12 May 2002 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SPOKES | Trustee | 12 May 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.