PENCADER IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of playing field for sports activities and community activities such as carnival week. The hall facilities used for various group meetings, daytime and evening social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 26 September 1978: Standard registration
- PIDA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Nunes | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Griffiths | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bill Hurst | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £14.07k | £14.81k | £11.53k | £6.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £2.15k | £18.09k | £12.20k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | £12.00k | £8.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PENCADER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON AFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECRETION AND LEISURE-TIME CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FUTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
PENCADER
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Golwg Yr Ogof
PENCADER
Dyfed
SA39 9HS
- Phone:
- 01559384558
- Email:
- annwyn15@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
PENCADERPAVILIONCARMARTHENSHIRE.SA399ES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window