THE BLACKHAWK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping disadvantaged children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 April 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
- United States
Governance
- 05 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY AVIGDOR KAHALANI | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN ACOCA | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/04/2017 | 20/04/2018 | 20/04/2019 | 20/04/2020 | 20/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £13.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £9.30k | £7.75k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 20 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 20 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 20 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WORLDWIDE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO ARE TERMINALLY ILL OR HAVE LIFE-SHORTENING ILLNESSES OR THE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR THOSE IN NEED OF EDUCATION, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF OTHER INSTITUTIONS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37th Floor,
1 Canada Square, Canary Wharf
LONDON
E14 5AA
- Phone:
- 02037514311
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window