Accounts and annual returns A STAGE FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1167083
Charity reporting is overdue by 1523 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days
Annual return 09 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days
Annual return 09 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 793 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 793 days
Annual return 09 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1158 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1158 days
Annual return 09 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1523 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1523 days