A STAGE FOR CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 May 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 13 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUWADAMILOLA DAMILOLA BENJAMIN OLUBANDO | Chair | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUNIAS ADU-GYAMFI | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABIODUN OLUBANDO BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/05/2017 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days | |
Annual return | 09 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 445 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 445 days | |
Annual return | 09 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 811 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 811 days | |
Annual return | 09 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1176 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1176 days | |
Annual return | 09 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1541 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1541 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH EDUCATION BY: - ENABLING IMPOVERISHED CHILDREN TO ATTEND SCHOOL BY SUPPLYING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS FOR THEIR BENEFIT; - HELPING TO BUILD SCHOOLS AND PAYING SCHOOL FEES FOR THOSE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND - ENSURING THAT CHILDREN HAVE ACCESS TO CLEAN WATER AND FOOD WITH THE AIM OF HELPING TO IMPROVE CHILDREN’S PERFORMANCE AND DEVELOPMENT AT SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
171 HIGHBURY NEW PARK
LONDON
N5 2TU
- Phone:
- 07908107476
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window