HEXTABLE COMMUNITY COLLECTIVE T/A THE HOWARD VENUE

Charity Number: 1167877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides a not for profit community facility for dance, fitness, music and social events. The centre provides these services for all ages and abilities in order to maintain and develop the physical and mental wellbeing of the community of Hextable Village and the surrounding district of Sevenoaks.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £211,567
Total expenditure: £144,680

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VICTORIA LOUISE FLAHERTY Chair 08 April 2025
None on record
DEE MORRIS Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
Darren Charles Kitchener Trustee 11 June 2021
None on record
Alexander Cooper Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
SAMANTHA JANE GODDARD Trustee 28 June 2016
None on record
PAM HOWARD Trustee 28 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £138.88k £114.61k £160.47k £190.83k £211.57k
Total expenditure £96.22k £85.71k £113.17k £130.53k £144.68k
Income from government contracts £4.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £44.43k £7.50k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 17 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 27 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 15 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 08 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 16 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Howard Venue
39 Egerton Avenue
Hextable
SWANLEY
Kent
BR8 7LG
Phone:
01322 618618