WORCESTERSHIRE BREAST UNIT HAVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides support in cases of medical, financial emotional or practical need for: - Anyone resident in Worcestershire who are suffering from or at risk of suffering from Breast Cancer - Their families and dependants - To support scientific research into the causes of breast cancer and publish results that are useful - To otherwise relieve sickness by prevention or treatment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 17 January 2017: Standard registration
- 20 December 2018: Funds received from 1077332 WORCESTER BREAST CANCER SUPPORT GROUP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Penelope Haggett | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicola Jayne O'Hara | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Lorraine Preece | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Lady Alexandra Joicey Winnington | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN MALIN | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
DAWN EMMA OLIVER | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
FIONA ELIZABETH CHARNY | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Steven Thrush | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.21k | £187.26k | £229.38k | £153.63k | £212.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.17k | £65.66k | £63.66k | £138.70k | £277.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 January 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 January 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO: 4.1 THE RELIEF IN CASES OF MEDICAL, FINANCIAL, EMOTIONAL OR PRACTICAL NEED OF: 4.1.1 ANYONE NORMALLY RESIDENT IN WORCESTERSHIRE AND/OR UNDER THE CARE OF THE WORCESTERSHIRE ACUTE HOSPITALS NHS TRUST (OR ANY SUCCESSOR BODY) WHO HAS SUFFERED, OR IS SUFFERING OR IS AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM CANCER OF THE BREAST (“BREAST CANCER PATIENTS”) AND 4.1.2 THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS OF BREAST CANCER PATIENTS (INCLUDING FORMER PATIENTS AND DECEASED PATIENTS). 4.2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SUPPORTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF CANCER OF THE BREAST AND THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF BREAST CANCER PATIENTS ON TERMS THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED. 4.3 TO OTHERWISE RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PREVENTING OR TREATING ILLNESS RELATED TO CANCER OF THE BREAST IN WORCESTERSHIRE. 4.4 THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WORCESTERSHIRE IN RELATION TO THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND ALLEVIATION OF CANCER OF THE BREAST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worcestershire Breast Unit
Charles Hastings Way
WORCESTER
WR5 1DD
- Phone:
- 01905733786
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window