BIRMINGHAM SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1166821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Samaritans provides completely confidential emotional support 24-hours a day by telephone, face-to-face, email and text, at festivals and outside our centres in prisons, hospitals, schools and workplaces and with the homeless through a network of over 200 branches in the UK and Republic of Ireland. Birmingham Samaritans acts as one of these branches.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £102,649
Total expenditure: £93,852

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SAMARITANS LTD BIRMINGHAM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Green Chair 13 March 2025
None on record
George Lee Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Siwei Liu Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
John David Rutter Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Rose Amanda Francesca Pardo Roques Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
Paul Singh Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
Selina Sfeir Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Robert Allan Cluley Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Mark Williams Trustee 28 September 2020
THE OAKLAND FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.99k £96.70k £43.60k £66.90k £102.65k
Total expenditure £73.49k £75.94k £65.96k £90.49k £93.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.70k £25.00k £25.00k £25.63k £25.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 01 DECEMBER 1994 AND AMENDED ON 19 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BIRMINGHAM
Registration history
  • 31 December 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
13 BOW STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B1 1DW
Phone:
01216225165