THE 1853 SOCIETY (ROYAL RUSSELL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The 1853 Society is the Parents' Association of Royal Russell School with the objective to develop effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school and the wider community. It engages in or funds activities or provides facilities or equipment which supports the school and charitable endeavours of the school and advances the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Lang | Chair | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Photiou | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Lui | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Jane Davidson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Green | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Gardiner | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Taylor | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Church | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Ferguson Patterson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Consuelo Otero Santiago | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dina Mallett | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Harrison | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ARGO | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Mosimann | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rihal | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.52k | £33.20k | £44.01k | £51.76k | £76.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.17k | £36.12k | £33.46k | £34.24k | £106.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 214 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Russell School Trust
Coombe Lane
CROYDON
CR9 5BX
- Phone:
- 02086574433
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window