Accounts and annual returns WADWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 508000
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 September 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 February 2022 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 February 2022 552 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required