Financial history CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1166874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.99k £30.86k £21.18k £21.16k £25.87k
Total expenditure £29.89k £21.73k £25.22k £37.65k £24.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A