Linked charities CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT SAMARITANS
Charity number: 1166874

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1969 AS AMENDED 17 FEBRUARY 1971 , 3 JUNE 1975, 7 MAY 1996 AND 13 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION, AND ALSO, WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT
Registration history
- 19 September 1969 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.