Financial history KEEP IT UP

Charity number: 1167940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £89.82k £92.61k £91.85k £87.68k £77.48k
Total expenditure £75.76k £44.47k £41.49k £50.50k £44.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A