LITTLE BIRCH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of a village hall for use of the inhabitants of the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 26 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Roberts | Chair | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda Maden | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Nichol | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Taylor | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rick Hampton | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dillon | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iris Lloyd | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Green | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clarke | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bolam | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.73k | £11.02k | £11.86k | £31.10k | £9.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.37k | £7.65k | £12.79k | £30.71k | £23.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.25k | £17.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 December 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 MAY 1978
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LITTLE BIRCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lynwood
Wrigglebrook
Kingsthorne
HEREFORD
HR2 8AR
- Phone:
- 07702760789
- Email:
- b3nroberts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window