Trustees LITTLE BIRCH VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 508003

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Roberts | Chair | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda Maden | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Nichol | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Taylor | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rick Hampton | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dillon | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iris Lloyd | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Green | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clarke | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bolam | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.