Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEWORTH YORK
Charity number: 1167059

Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Poulton MBE | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alys Tarr | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Carter-Smye | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Paul Jenkins | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Poulton MBE | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Waller | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Uney | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Perkins | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Robson | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDITH ANN MANSFIELD | Trustee | 01 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ROBERT BLOOMFIELD | Trustee | 01 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANN GILL | Trustee | 01 November 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.