SUPERFICIAL SIDEROSIS - THE SILENT BLEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer guidance and support to those with Superficial Siderosis, their families, friends, carers and physicians. The charity was developed to aid those with this rare neurological condition to share, network and find further information. We raise funds for research into finding a cure for the disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 26 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON KELVIN ROBERTS | Chair | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sydney-James Fearn-Roberts | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA FEARN BA HONS | Trustee | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £3.26k | £1.01k | £5.10k | £1.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £716 | £2.07k | £3.07k | £4.27k | £342 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 September 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 September 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 August 2022 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 August 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 August 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF EVERYONE ABOUT THE RARE DISEASE SUPERFICIAL SIDEROSIS - SPECIFICALLY SUFFERERS OF THE DISEASE, THEIR CARERS AND THEIR PHYSICIANS. TO ALSO HELP FUND ONGOING, ESTABLISHED AND NEW MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO SUPERFICIAL SIDEROSIS, BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND ESTABLISHING NETWORKS OF PROFESSIONALS AND PATIENTS THROUGH OUR WEBSITE AND SOCIAL MEDIA. (B) TO ADVANCE HEALTH AND SAVE LIVES THROUGH: INFORMATION DISSEMINATION TO SUPERFICIAL SIDEROSIS SUFFERERS, CARERS AND THEIR PHYSICIANS; IN ORDER TO SUPPORT SUFFERERS IN GETTING ACCESS TO THE MEDICAL CARE AND TREATMENTS THEY NEED. WE WILL DO THIS THROUGH OUR WEBSITE, PRINTED LEAFLETS AND OTHER MATERIAL AND BY ORGANISING SOCIAL AND VIRTUAL EVENTS USING SOCIAL MEDIA. (C) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF DISABILITY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO SUFFERERS, THEIR CARERS AND PHYSICIANS. WE WILL DO THIS THROUGH OUR WEBSITE, PRINTED LEAFLETS AND OTHER MATERIAL AND BY ORGANISING SOCIAL AND VIRTUAL EVENTS USING SOCIAL MEDIA. (D) THE CHARITY IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUPERFICIAL SIDEROSIS SUFFERERS, THEIR CARERS AND THEIR PHYSICIANS WORLDWIDE, NOT JUST IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Laburnum Close
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU11 3DX
- Phone:
- 07870625357
- Email:
- silentbleed101@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window