Trustees ROMSLEY ST KENELM'S SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 508006

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Robert Matthews | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Rosina Smith | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan George Spencer Flood | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Baker | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Jayne Cooper | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rod Cartwright | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA-JADE PICKFORD-PERRY | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATE YARNOLD | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR JOHN GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDY SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.