LITTLE HEROES ASD SUPPORT

Charity number: 1167631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AFFECTED BY AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER (ASD) AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN SOUTHEND ON SEA, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION, OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESPITE, SOCIAL ACTIVITIES AND NETWORKING. WE HOLD WEEKLY DROP IN SESSIONS FOR THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM, IN ADDITION DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS WE ORGANISE SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £208,313
Total expenditure: £189,285

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Southend-on-sea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Isaac Chair 26 November 2024
None on record
Lorriane Walter Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Karen Pearson Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Ashley Corsini-King Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Sarah Sibthorpe Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Daniel Sibthorpe Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Sarah Phillip Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Kelly Aslett Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Emma Jiao-Knuckey Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £91.96k £114.23k £115.53k £207.06k £208.31k
Total expenditure £57.73k £82.64k £97.82k £134.21k £189.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.35k £11.00k £8.01k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 31 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 31 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 28 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Little Heroes ASD Support Hub
Garon Park Community Centre
Garon Park
Southend-on-Sea
Essex
SS2 4FA
Phone:
07379 897947