Trustees LITTLE HEROES ASD SUPPORT
Charity number: 1167631

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Isaac | Chair | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorriane Walter | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Pearson | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Corsini-King | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sibthorpe | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Sibthorpe | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Phillip | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Aslett | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jiao-Knuckey | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.